This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 02:58:19 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs. Jose Linares

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jose Linares. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7229

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Defendant

Linares, Jose

Kerman, CA 93630

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ruiz, Abril F.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Midland_21-164445_com_eABC.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

Midland_21-164445_ccs_eABC.pdf

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration pursuant to CCP Section 395 (b); Venue for personal, family or household obligations.

Declaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed

Midland_21-164445_rfe_eABC.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Midland_21-164445_sum_eABC.pdf

Declaration Filed

PONS_eABC_Proof_92565224.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Non- Service of Summons and Complaint for Jose Linares

Proof of Service

POS_eABC_Proof_92677669.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- POS_eABC_Proof_92677669.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- PONS_eABC_Proof_92565224.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Non- Service of Summons and Complaint for Jose Linares

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Credit Management Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-60206 Midland Credit Management Inc. $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Credit Management Inc.: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Midland Credit Management Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Midland_21-164445_sum_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed- Midland_21-164445_rfe_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration pursuant to CCP Section 395 (b); Venue for personal, family or household obligations.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Midland_21-164445_ccs_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Midland_21-164445_com_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruiz, Abril