Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 19:33:07 (UTC).

Mid-Century Insurance Company vs. TAP Worldwide, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 Mid-Century Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TAP Worldwide, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Tharpe, D Tyler and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0728

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Tharpe, D Tyler

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mid-Century Insurance Company

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TAP Worldwide, LLC

Fresno Chrysler Jeep, Inc.

Dealer Services International

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Fresno Chrysler Jeep, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Davidian, Lina S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Fernald, Brandon C.

Bernhardt, Victoria R.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Bernhardt, Victoria R.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

jury fees.pdf; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 7/9/20 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Proof of Service

POS.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Case Management Statement Filed

CMS.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Proof of Service

POS.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Answer Filed

ANSWER.pdf; Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint

Cross Complaint Filed

3528810_012MidCentur; Comment: 1st Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service

pos.pdf

Answer Filed

answer.pdf

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated 3-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:32 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketJury Requested by Party- Comment: Estimated 3-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for TAP Worldwide, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-47152 TAP Worldwide, LLC $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for TAP Worldwide, LLC: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mid-Century Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-15765 Mid-Century Insurance Company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mid-Century Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Mid-Century Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 7/9/20 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fresno Chrysler Jeep, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TAP WORLDWIDE LLC D/B/A 4 WHEEL PARTS PERFORMANCE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Nextgear Capital, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant