This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/07/2020 at 13:09:52 (UTC).

Michele Davidian vs. Loren D. Balzer Individually and

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Michele Davidian filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Loren D Balzer Individually and. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2624

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Davidian, Michele Buckner

Defendants

Tulare Street Investments

Loren D. Balzer Individually and

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Judgment

SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Davidian, Michele Buckner; Loren D. Balzer Individually and; Comment: without prejudice

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Davidian, Michele Buckner; Loren D. Balzer Individually and; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$15.00/Unserved: no signature

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Davidian, Michele Buckner: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00014167 Davidian, Michele Buckner $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Davidian, Michele Buckner: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Davidian, Michele Buckner; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's claim mailed certified mail- Comment: Tracking number: 7018 1830 0000 6823 7422

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.