This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 18:28:03 (UTC).

Michael Bouillon vs. Lennar Fresno, Inc. / COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Michael Bouillon filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Lennar Fresno, Inc / COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3373

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clark, Richard F

Gonzalez, Maximo

Khachikyan, Raymond

Nezbailo, Natalija

Ulrich, Carol Lea

Nelson, Stephanie

Okada, Emory

Lorenzo, Dana L

Ulrich, James Ward

Villamizar, Amanda

Conley, Anthony D

Curoso, James M

Wu, Wah W.

Clark, Georgia R

Alvarez, Jane

Lorenzo, Gary M

Slosarik, Lisa

Franklin, Peggie

Defendants

Lennar Homes of California, Inc

Lennar Fresno, Inc.

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Guthrie, Lori J

Defendant Attorney

Packer, Alan H.

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: Case Management Conference Order No. 1

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: to appoint special master

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for:stipulation appoint special master

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Plaintiffs' Second Amendment to Complaint Naming Additional Homeowners

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: lift stay and adding plaintiffs

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: ***Order signed and entered*** Forwarded to 502 - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Lifting Stay and Adding Plaintiffs

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: from Chambers with Certificate of Mailing

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Khachikyan, Raymond; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: Case Management Conference Order No. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature- Comment: ***Order signed and entered*** Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for: CMC No. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bouillon, Michael Ray: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment filed- Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: Document: First Amendment to Complaint Naming Additional Homeowners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bouillon, Michael Ray: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-74794 Bouillon, Michael Ray $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bouillon, Michael Ray: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Bouillon, Michael Ray; Total Financial Assessment $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lennar Fresno, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant