This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 04:06:24 (UTC).

Matthew Bologna vs. Paul Blanco's Good Car Company Fresno, Inc., a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Matthew Bologna filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Paul Blanco's Good Car Company Fresno, Inc , a California Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Brickey, Gabriel, Cullers, Mark and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5428

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

Cullers, Mark

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bologna, Matthew

Defendants

Great America Insurance Company

Paul Blanco's Good Car Company Fresno, Inc., a California Corporation

Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC

Paul Blanco

Putu Ratna Blanco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadr, Kasra

Defendant Attorneys

Nys, Mark H

Cummings, Andrew M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Paul Blanco's Good Car Company Fresno, Inc.

Answer Filed

Great American Answer.pdf

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Great American Insurance Company

Civil Complaint filed

5290 Complaint.pdf

Summons issued and filed

5290 Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set on 2/11/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 501.

Summons issued and filed

5290 Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

5290 CCCS.pdf

3/22/22 - Substitution of Attorney

03/22/2022: 3/22/22 - Substitution of Attorney

adr stip signed SE_Redacted.pdf

01/11/2022: adr stip signed SE_Redacted.pdf

SOA Bologna v Paul Blanco's Good 20CECL05428.pdf

11/22/2021: SOA Bologna v Paul Blanco's Good 20CECL05428.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

10/07/2021: Minute Order Attachment

5290 STIP (ADR) & POS.pdf

09/10/2021: 5290 STIP (ADR) & POS.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

09/09/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Order Granted

07/27/2021: Order Granted

OC65867.-scan (119).pdf

07/22/2021: OC65867.-scan (119).pdf

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

07/22/2021: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated 2 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Steven E. Ernest New Attorney: Andrew M. Cummings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: AAA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: Old Attorney: Cooksey, Toolen, Gage Duffy & Woog New Attorney: Geraci Law Firm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation - Not All Signed; Comment: Not signed by: Unanswered defendants and Plaintiff Party(s) who signed: Nima Heydari ADR method chosen: Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: as to Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: as to Paul Blanco's Good Car Company Fresno, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bologna, Matthew: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-66280 Bologna, Matthew $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bologna, Matthew: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Bologna, Matthew; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set on 2/11/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 501.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAUL BLANCO'S GOOD CAR COMPANY FRESNO, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA