This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 13:55:02 (UTC).

Mark Williquette vs. Harris Ranch Beef Company

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 Mark Williquette filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Harris Ranch Beef Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Skiles, Jon M, Whalen, Robert, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2594

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Skiles, Jon M

Whalen, Robert

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Williquette, Mark

Martinez, Timothy

Norris, Stephen

Defendant

Harris Ranch Beef Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tillmon, Seth E.

Defendant Attorney

Helsley, Michael S.

 

Court Documents

8/22/22 Complaint

08/22/2022: 8/22/22 Complaint

8/22/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/22/2022: 8/22/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/22/22 Notice of Attorney Lien

08/22/2022: 8/22/22 Notice of Attorney Lien

8/23/22 Summons

08/23/2022: 8/23/22 Summons

8/23/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

08/23/2022: 8/23/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

9-2-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint

09/02/2022: 9-2-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint

10/11/22 Answer

10/11/2022: 10/11/22 Answer

Case Management Statement

12/20/2022: Case Management Statement

12/22/22 CMC Statement ~ Hearing 1/4/23

12/22/2022: 12/22/22 CMC Statement ~ Hearing 1/4/23

12/28/22 Notice of Jury Deposit

12/28/2022: 12/28/22 Notice of Jury Deposit

01/04/23 Minute Order Attachment

01/04/2023: 01/04/23 Minute Order Attachment

1/23/23 Notice of Judge Reassignment

01/23/2023: 1/23/23 Notice of Judge Reassignment

1/31/23 Stipulation Regarding ADR

01/31/2023: 1/31/23 Stipulation Regarding ADR

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated time for trial is 5-6 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2024
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Case Reassigned to Judge Jon M. Skiles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties; Comment: Estimated time for trial is 5-6 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAppeared in Person; Comment: Attorney S. Crass appearing on behalf of attorney S. Tillmon Attorney Steve Crass appearing on behalf of M. Helsley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Williquette, Mark: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-52273 Williquette, Mark $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Williquette, Mark: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Williquette, Mark; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Attorney's Lien of Seth E. Tillmon, Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less