This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/18/2021 at 16:02:47 (UTC).

Mark Lindon vs. K.W.P.H. Enterprises/COMPLEX/CLASS ACTION

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Mark Lindon filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against K W P H Enterprises/COMPLEX/CLASS ACTION. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3667

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lindon, Mark

on behalf of himself and all other similarly situated

Defendants

American Ambulance

K.W.P.H. Enterprises

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pyle, Hunter

Defendant Attorney

Coderniz, Diane E.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Bob Adams ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, et al.

Motion filed

Motion (No Fee); Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay Action

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: (Pending Hearing) Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Diane Coderniz ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, etc.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: ISO Motion to Compel

Proof of Service

SF30848.2021-01-08 Lindon - POS re Ntc of CMC.pdf; Comment: Notice of calendar setting

Proof of Service

2021-01-05 Lindon - POS of Summons re KWPH.pdf

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: Notice of New Time and Department for Case Management Conference

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 4/22/21 at 1:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

LA110796.2020-12-16 Lindon - Summons.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

LA110796.2020-12-16 Lindon - Civil Case Cover Shee.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

2020-12-16 Lindon - Complaint.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPetition - Compel Arbitration- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Diane Coderniz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for K.W.P.H. Enterprises: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-10925 K.W.P.H. Enterprises $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for K.W.P.H. Enterprises: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: K.W.P.H. Enterprises; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Bob Adams ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion filed- Motion (No Fee); Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: (Pending Hearing) Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Diane Coderniz ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities- Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: ISO Motion to Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- SF30848.2021-01-08 Lindon - POS re Ntc of CMC.pdf; Comment: Notice of calendar setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- 2021-01-05 Lindon - POS of Summons re KWPH.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: Notice of New Time and Department for Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lindon, Mark: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-81097 Lindon, Mark $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lindon, Mark: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Lindon, Mark; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 4/22/21 at 1:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- LA110796.2020-12-16 Lindon - Summons.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- LA110796.2020-12-16 Lindon - Civil Case Cover Shee.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 2020-12-16 Lindon - Complaint.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.W.P.H. Enterprises is a litigant

Latest cases where on behalf of himself and all members of the putative class is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN AMBULANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIANE, CODERNIZ E