Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/20/2021 at 13:50:46 (UTC).

Maria Rios vs. Safeway, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Maria Rios filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Safeway, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1209

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rios, Mario

Rios, Maria

Defendants

Safeway, Inc.

Vons

Albertson's, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dufour, Michael R.

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

42883SummonsS002e055

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 8/26/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Civil case cover sheet

42200CivilCas01e533a

Civil Complaint filed

42200Complain00b9695

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- 42883SummonsS002e055

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 8/26/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rios, Maria: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-26141 Rios, Mario $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rios, Maria: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Rios, Maria; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 42200CivilCas01e533a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 42200Complain00b9695

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE VONS COMPANIES INC DBA PAVILIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUFOUR MICHAEL R