This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 12:15:39 (UTC).

Margarita Ordaz Santiago vs. Alex Fragoza

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 Margarita Ordaz Santiago filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Alex Fragoza. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3243

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Herrera, Ricardo

Ordaz Santiago, Margarita

Herrera, Teresa

Herrera, Misael

Herrera, Christopher

Defendants

Fragoza, Alex

Ezernack, Billy W., II

Double E Trucking

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cornwell, Stephen R.

Defendant Attorney

Rossmiller, Anthony R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: Notice of new time and department for CMC

Notice Filed

4109290_853FRAGOZAJu; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Answer Filed

4109290_892FRAGOZAAn

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Summons on Defendant Double E Trucking.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: Notice of new time and department for CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ezernack, Billy W., II: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2020-02537 Fragoza, Alex $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fragoza, Alex: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2020-02536 Fragoza, Alex $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketTransfer of Fees Completed- Comment: For WEB-2020-81064

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ezernack, Billy W., II: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Ezernack, Billy W., II; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fragoza, Alex: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Fragoza, Alex; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- 4109290_853FRAGOZAJu; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Summons on Defendant Double E Trucking.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ordaz Santiago, Margarita: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-72614 Ordaz Santiago, Margarita $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ordaz Santiago, Margarita: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Ordaz Santiago, Margarita; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less