This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/13/2023 at 01:32:20 (UTC).

Margaret Bakle vs. Frank Bonboster

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 Margaret Bakle filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Frank Bonboster. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Whalen, Robert and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3998

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Whalen, Robert

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bakle, Margaret

Estate of Sergio Bonboster

Defendants

Bonboster, Frank

County of Fresno

Aspiranet

Cross Plaintiff

Madrid, Lawrence

Cross Defendant and Defendant

Aspiranet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pruitt, Andrew S.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Long, Margaret E.

Friedenthal, Daniel

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

04/28/2023: Minute Order Attachment

04/06/23 Proof of Service

04/06/2023: 04/06/23 Proof of Service

4/4/23 - Notice of Jury Deposit

04/04/2023: 4/4/23 - Notice of Jury Deposit

4/4/23 - 1st Cross Complaint

04/04/2023: 4/4/23 - 1st Cross Complaint

4/4/23 - Answer to First Amended

04/04/2023: 4/4/23 - Answer to First Amended

4-3-23 Request for Dismissal of Frank Bonboster

04/03/2023: 4-3-23 Request for Dismissal of Frank Bonboster

Minute Order Attachment

04/03/2023: Minute Order Attachment

3-30-23 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re: Aspiranet

03/30/2023: 3-30-23 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re: Aspiranet

3-23-23 First Amended Complaint

03/23/2023: 3-23-23 First Amended Complaint

Case Management Statement.pdf

04/25/2023: Case Management Statement.pdf

04/24/23 Case Management Statement - HRG

04/24/2023: 04/24/23 Case Management Statement - HRG

4/21/23 RJN re Demurrer HRG 9/20/23

04/21/2023: 4/21/23 RJN re Demurrer HRG 9/20/23

4/218/23 Dec of McLeran ISO Demurrer HRG 9/20/23

04/21/2023: 4/218/23 Dec of McLeran ISO Demurrer HRG 9/20/23

4/21/23 Memo re Demurrer to FAC HRG 9/20/23

04/21/2023: 4/21/23 Memo re Demurrer to FAC HRG 9/20/23

4/21/23 Demurrer to FAC HRG 9/20/23

04/21/2023: 4/21/23 Demurrer to FAC HRG 9/20/23

4/7/23 - Summons 1st Cross

04/07/2023: 4/7/23 - Summons 1st Cross

4/4/23 - Case Management Statement

04/04/2023: 4/4/23 - Case Management Statement

CMS - Plaintiffs.pdf

03/29/2023: CMS - Plaintiffs.pdf

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • DocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Margaret Long - Filed 4/21/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: From Chambers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Original Type: Chambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for County of Fresno: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for County of Fresno: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: County of Fresno; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Comment: IOS Demurrer to FAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Successor In Interest; Exhibit 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Estate of Sergio Bonboster: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-78010 Estate of Sergio Bonboster $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Estate of Sergio Bonboster: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Estate of Sergio Bonboster; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and assignment of Judge for all purposes assigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less