This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/08/2022 at 13:07:49 (UTC).

Mardi Barnard vs. The Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Mardi Barnard filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1834

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barnard, Mardi

Defendants

The Regents of the University of California

Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center d.b.a. Community Regional Medical Center

Community Regional Medical Center

Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc.

Zakhary, George, Medical Doctor

Chan, Christopher Alan, Dentist

Casteel, Rachna Shenoy, Dentist

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dias, Steven S.

 

Court Documents

6/17/2022 Guardian Ad Litem

06/17/2022: 6/17/2022 Guardian Ad Litem

6/17/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/17/2022: 6/17/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2022 Complaint

06/17/2022: 6/17/2022 Complaint

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

06/20/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barnard, Mardi: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-37491 Barnard, Mardi $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barnard, Mardi: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Barnard, Mardi; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Guardian Ad Litem Received; Comment: ***Order not signed, section 5a and 5d are incomplete, counsel to resumbit order*** Forwarded to Dept 502

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Central California Faculty Medical Group Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant