This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 14:06:01 (UTC).

Marciano Perez Valdez vs Margarita Polanco

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 Marciano Perez Valdez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Margarita Polanco. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2097

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Perez Valdez, Marciano

Defendants

Polanco, Margarita

Polanco, Juan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fanucchi, Allan

Defendant Attorney

Hitchcock, Kara L.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

comp.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

cccs.pdf

Summons issued and filed

summ.pdf

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Proof of Service

POS.pdf

Proof of Service

POS.pdf

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Case Management Statement Filed

CASE.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

JURY FEE.pdf; Comment: of Jury Deposit

Minute Order Attachment

11/18/21 CMC Minute Order Attachment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 5-7 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: 5-7 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- 11/18/21 CMC Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Polanco, Juan: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-69850 Polanco, Juan $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Polanco, Juan: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- POS.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- POS.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perez Valdez, Marciano: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-45575 Perez Valdez, Marciano $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perez Valdez, Marciano: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Perez Valdez, Marciano; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- summ.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- cccs.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- comp.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hitchcock, Kara L.