This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/10/2022 at 12:12:30 (UTC).

Manuel Villa vs. Trillium Pumps USA, INC. // COMPLEX // CLASS ACTION //

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Manuel Villa filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Trillium Pumps USA, INC // COMPLEX // CLASS ACTION . This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel, McGuire, Rosemary and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1104

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

McGuire, Rosemary

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Villa, Manuel

an individual(s), on behalf of himself and on behalf of all persons similarly situated

Defendants

Trillium Pumps USA, INC.

a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lapuyade, Jean-Claude

Defendant Attorney

Borchers, Jason H.

 

Court Documents

4/11/2022 Complaint

04/11/2022: 4/11/2022 Complaint

4/11/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/11/2022: 4/11/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2022 Summons

04/12/2022: 4/11/2022 Summons

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

04/13/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

4/22/2022-Proof of Service of Summons-Trillum Pumps

04/22/2022: 4/22/2022-Proof of Service of Summons-Trillum Pumps

6/3/22 General Denial

06/03/2022: 6/3/22 General Denial

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Trillium Pumps USA, INC.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-34086 Trillium Pumps USA, INC. $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Trillium Pumps USA, INC.: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Trillium Pumps USA, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: ***DEFECTIVE: Name listed in Item 3a does not match what is listed on Item 3b

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Villa, Manuel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-22739 Villa, Manuel $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Villa, Manuel: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Villa, Manuel; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A Delaware Corp. XPO Logistics is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BORCHERS, JASON H