This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 23:14:44 (UTC).

Mantej Singh vs. Vikram Vohra / CLASS ACTION

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Mantej Singh filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Vikram Vohra / CLASS ACTION. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3641

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Defendants

Fast N Esy 13 Corporation

Fast N Esy #16 Corporation

Fast N Esy #18 Corporation

Fast N Esy II, Inc.

Fast N Esy 28 Corporation

Fast N Esy #12 Corporation

Vohra, Vikram

Fast N Esy 26 Corporation

Fast N Esy 7 Corporation

Fast N Esy 21 Corporation

Fast N Esy 11 Corporation

Fast N Esy #15 Corporation

Fast N Esy 25 Corporation

Fast N Esy 23 Corporation

Fast N Esy 14 Corporation

Fast N Esy 22 Corporation

Fast N Esy 6 Corporation

Fast N Esy #4 Corporation

Fast N Esy 29 Corporation

a California corporation

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Kharazi, Hadi-Ty S.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: HRG 04/22/21

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: from Chambers and Certificate of Mailing

Conditional Settlement Reached

Notice; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 10/30/2023

Notice of Hearing

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Scheduled Hearing

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of H. Ty Kharazi In Support Of Request For Dismissal with Prejudice and Order Thereon

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: **Fwd to research for further review**Forwarded to Dept: 503 Order for: Dismissal

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: dismiss Mantej Singh with prejudice; dismiss potential and putative class members without prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2024
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: Singh, Mantej; Vohra, Vikram; Fast N Esy Corporation; Fast N Esy II, Inc.; Fast N Esy #4 Corporation; Fast N Esy 5 Corporation; Fast N Esy 6 Corporation; Fast N Esy 7 Corporation; Fast N Esy #9 Corporation; Fast N Esy 11 Corporation; Fast N Esy #12 Corporation; Fast N Esy 13 Corporation; Fast N Esy 14 Corporation; Fast N Esy #15 Corporation; Fast N Esy #16 Corporation; Fast N Esy #17 Corporation; Fast N Esy #18 Corporation; Fast N Esy #20 Corporation; Fast N Esy 21 Corporation; Fast N Esy 22 Corporation; Fast N Esy 23 Corporation; Fast N Esy 24 Corporation; Fast N Esy 25 Corporation; Fast N Esy 26 Corporation; Fast N Esy 28 Corporation; Fast N Esy 29 Corporation; Comment: dismiss Mantej Singh with prejudice; dismiss potential & putative class members without prejudice **see 7-29-2021 scanned Order**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Comment: dismiss Mantej Singh with prejudice; dismiss potential and putative class members without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: **Fwd to research for further review**Forwarded to Dept: 503 Order for: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of H. Ty Kharazi In Support Of Request For Dismissal with Prejudice and Order Thereon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Scheduled Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Reached- Notice; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 10/30/2023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: from Chambers and Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement; Comment: HRG 04/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Singh, Mantej: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-80984 Singh, Mantej $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Singh, Mantej: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Singh, Mantej; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A CALIFORNIA LIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHARAZI, HADI-TY S