This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/28/2020 at 23:18:59 (UTC).

Macario RayRay Rapisura (Estate)

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Macario RayRay Rapisura Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0632

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Quezada, Rubith

Decedent

Rapisura, Macario RayRay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Broderick-Villa, William

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketContinued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketLetters (Estates)- Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketProbate Bond Filed- Comment: Amount: $20,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketOrder for Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketContinued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration- Comment: Declaration and Second Supplement to Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketPetition- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Letters of Administration; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketSupplement to- Comment: Supplement to Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities- Comment: Confidential Supplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication- Comment: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities (Estates)- Comment: Duties and Liabilities - Estate of Rapisura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketPetition for Probate- Comment: Letters of Administration; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.