This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/02/2019 at 06:11:42 (UTC).

LVNV Funding, LLC vs. James Romero

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by LVNV Funding, LLC against James Romero in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6256

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding, LLC

Defendant

Romero, James P

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

HarrisAndZide_TA024079_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

HarrisAndZide_TA024079_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Declaration Filed

HarrisAndZide_TA024079_mil_eABC.pdf; Comment: Non-Military Affidavit

Civil case cover sheet

HarrisAndZide_TA024079_ccs_eABC.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

HarrisAndZide_TA024079_com_eABC.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- HarrisAndZide_TA024079_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- HarrisAndZide_TA024079_mil_eABC.pdf; Comment: Non-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- HarrisAndZide_TA024079_ccs_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- HarrisAndZide_TA024079_com_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for LVNV Funding, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50378 LVNV Funding, LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for LVNV Funding, LLC: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial: LVNV Funding, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less