This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/19/2020 at 23:11:25 (UTC).

Lonna Young (CONS/PE)

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 Lonna Young CONS/PE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0611

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fresno County Public Guardian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kruthers, Heather H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • HearingProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • HearingInventory and Appraisal (Final)- Comment: Total Amount: $308,975.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • HearingStatus Report- Comment: Status Report Regarding Filing Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • HearingOrder (Generic)- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: Order for Compensation cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • HearingPetition- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Petition for Compensation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • HearingNotice of Hearing- Comment: Hrg: 9/18/2019; Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • HearingPetition (Generic)- Comment: Petition for Compensation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • HearingNotice of Opening or Changing an Account (G/C)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • HearingLetters of Conservatorship- Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2019
  • HearingLetters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship- Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • HearingOrder Appointing Temporary Conservator- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • HearingNotice of Hearing- Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • HearingNotice of Hearing- Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • HearingPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator- Comment: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • HearingOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • HearingDeclaration- Comment: Declaration of Deputy Public Guardian Stacy Mauro Regarding Sale of Proposed Conservatee's Real Property (Former Residence) and Personal Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • HearingStatus Report- Comment: Probate Conservatorship Investigation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • HearingConfidential Capacity Declaration- Comment: Capacity Declaration--Conservatorship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • HearingPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial)- Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person and Estate

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.