This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 05:22:40 (UTC).

Linda Martinez vs Johnnie Williams

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Linda Martinez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Johnnie Williams. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kalemkarian, David and Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4448

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kalemkarian, David

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Martinez, Linda Elizabeth

Respondent

Williams, Johnnie McGee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hebesha, Amanda G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • Docket1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Due Diligence re Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Martinez, Linda Elizabeth: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-68711 Martinez, Linda Elizabeth $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Martinez, Linda Elizabeth: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Martinez, Linda Elizabeth; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hebesha, Amanda G.