Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 16:01:33 (UTC).

Linda Gebbia vs. Sierra Pacific Orthopedics

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Linda Gebbia filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Sierra Pacific Orthopedics. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0224

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gebbia, Linda

Defendants

Sierra Pacific Orthopedics

Gill, Paramjeet, Medical Doctor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Malmo, John R.

Defendant Attorney

Canepa, Mark B.

 

Court Documents

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Jury Fees

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gill, Paramjeet, Medical Doctor: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2021-00767 Sierra Pacific Orthopedics $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sierra Pacific Orthopedics: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2021-00765 Sierra Pacific Orthopedics $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketTransfer of Fees Completed- Comment: For WEB-2021-15730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gill, Paramjeet, Medical Doctor: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Gill, Paramjeet, Medical Doctor; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sierra Pacific Orthopedics: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Sierra Pacific Orthopedics; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposit, payment,disbursment- Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gebbia, Linda: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-03920 Gebbia, Linda $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gebbia, Linda: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Gebbia, Linda; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Canepa, Mark B.