This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/15/2019 at 12:18:20 (UTC).

Liliya Chepurny vs. Raj Sidhu

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Liliya Chepurny filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Raj Sidhu. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1419

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chepurny, Liliya

Defendants

Raj Sidhu

Auto Empire of Fresno

 

Court Documents

Judgment

SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Chepurny, Liliya; Awarded Against:; Raj Sidhu; Amount; Damages: $6,857.24; Costs: $90.00; Total: $6947.24; Comment: Statement of Decision: Plaintiff has presented sufficient evidence to find in her favor in reasonable amount requested.; Party Names: Chepurny, Liliya; Raj Sidhu

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Court Trial

Court Trial; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Chepurny, Liliya; Awarded Against:; Raj Sidhu; Amount; Damages: $6,857.24; Costs: $90.00; Total: $6947.24; Comment: Statement of Decision: Plaintiff has presented sufficient evidence to find in her favor in reasonable amount requested.; Party Names: Chepurny, Liliya; Raj Sidhu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • HearingNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • HearingCourt Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Chepurny, Liliya

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • HearingPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • HearingPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$0.00-Unserved Defective: Item #3 is incomplete; needs to make a selection of the type of documents that were served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • HearingPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$0.00-Unserved Defective: Item #1a is incomplete; does not match the name on claim on file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • HearingPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$15.00-Unserved Defective: No Signature

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingPlaintiff's claim mailed certified mail- Comment: Tracking number: 7018 0680 1608 1990

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Chepurny, Liliya: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00007840 Chepurny, Liliya $97.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Chepurny, Liliya: Transaction Assessment $97.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Chepurny, Liliya; Total Financial Assessment $97.50; Total Payments and Credits $97.50

    Read MoreRead Less