This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 08:53:12 (UTC).

Letitia Sanches vs. Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Letitia Sanches filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0378

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanches, Letitia

Defendants

Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc., A California Corporation

Hobab, Hesam

Deli Delicious Franchising, Inc.

A California Corporation

The Original Deli D, Inc.

Doe 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kharazi, Hadi-Ty S.

Defendant Attorney

Schneider, David D

 

Court Documents

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Declaration; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Assignment of Judge for all purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 6/24/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Comment: Summons on Doe Amendment

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Amendment to Complaint Naming The Original Deli D, Inc. as Doe 1

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Order After PTDC & Certificate of Mailing

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Order on Request for PTDC (x2 filed 6/8/21) & Certificate of Mailing

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Order on Request for PTDC & Certificate of Mailing; Hearing set on 6/25/21 (re: Requests filed 6/1/21)

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Opposition; Comment: Fwd to Dept 403

Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Opposition; Comment: Fwd to Dept 403

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Patrick J. O'Hara

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCourt Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 2-4 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error; Comment: 2-4 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Comment: Summons on Doe Amendment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment filed- Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Amendment to Complaint Naming The Original Deli D, Inc. as Doe 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Order After PTDC & Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: Notice of Rescheduled Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sanches, Letitia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-06955 Sanches, Letitia $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sanches, Letitia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Sanches, Letitia; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: of Assignment of Judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified- Declaration; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 6/24/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A CALIFORNIA LIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHARAZI, HADI-TY S