This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 00:18:59 (UTC).

Leticia Aquino-Reyes vs. David B. Kaye M.D., INC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 Leticia Aquino-Reyes filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against David B Kaye M D , INC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Negin, Stephanie, Whalen, Robert and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0978

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Negin, Stephanie

Whalen, Robert

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aquino-Reyes, Leticia

Defendants

David B. Kaye M.D., INC

Kaye, David B., Medical Doctor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shapazian, Larry H.

Defendant Attorneys

Parker, Alden J.

Rodriguez, Marco A.

 

Court Documents

3/30/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/30/2022: 3/30/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/30/2022 Complaint

03/30/2022: 3/30/2022 Complaint

4/1/2022 Summons

04/01/2022: 4/1/2022 Summons

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

04/01/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

07/28/22 Case Management Statement

07/11/2022: 07/28/22 Case Management Statement

7/11/22 Plaintiff's Jury Deposit

07/11/2022: 7/11/22 Plaintiff's Jury Deposit

Minute Order Attachment

07/14/2022: Minute Order Attachment

7/15/22 Proof of Service ~ David Kaye, M.D.

07/15/2022: 7/15/22 Proof of Service ~ David Kaye, M.D.

8/15/2022-Answer of Dr. Kaye, M.D

08/15/2022: 8/15/2022-Answer of Dr. Kaye, M.D

Case Management Statement

09/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Def CMC Statement (S 9.13.22 CMC 9.28.22).pdf

09/13/2022: Def CMC Statement (S 9.13.22 CMC 9.28.22).pdf

9/20/22 - Proof of Service

09/20/2022: 9/20/22 - Proof of Service

9/28/2022-Minute Order Attachment

09/28/2022: 9/28/2022-Minute Order Attachment

10-20-22 Defendant Kaye M.D. Inc.'s Answer

10/20/2022: 10-20-22 Defendant Kaye M.D. Inc.'s Answer

Case Management Statement 12/22/22

12/06/2022: Case Management Statement 12/22/22

12-7-22 Defendants' Case Management Statement

12/07/2022: 12-7-22 Defendants' Case Management Statement

12/22/22 Minute Order Attachment

12/22/2022: 12/22/22 Minute Order Attachment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated time for trial is 6-7 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2024
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketJury Requested by Party; Comment: Estimated time for trial is 6-7 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: NEXT HRG 12/22/22: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for David B. Kaye M.D., INC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-66011 David B. Kaye M.D., INC $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Aquino-Reyes, Leticia: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Jury Deposit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: NEXT HRG 7/28/22: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Aquino-Reyes, Leticia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-20166 Aquino-Reyes, Leticia $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Aquino-Reyes, Leticia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Aquino-Reyes, Leticia; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kaye, David, Medical Doctor is a litigant

Latest cases where David B. Kayne M.D., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ, MARCO ANTONIO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER ALDEN J.