Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 16:01:22 (UTC).

Leslie Dawkins vs. Secure MD Professionals - California, PC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Leslie Dawkins filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Secure MD Professionals - California, PC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0039

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

on behalf of all aggrieved employees

Dawkins, Leslie

Defendant

Secure MD Professionals - California, PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rose, Adam M.

Defendant Attorney

Bruno, Michael D.

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

SF38020.DAWKINS - ANS TO COMPLAINT.pdf

Proof of Service

Dawkins- CA POS Sub 02.23.21 v1.pdf

Request to Enter Default Denied

20210218140003350.pdf; Comment: Defective proof of service of summons and complaint, also line #1.c. does not match complaint.

Proof of Service

5232055 - SIGNED POS.pdf

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 5/13/21 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

20210105140038004.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

20210105140041807.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

20210105140034033.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Secure MD Professionals - California, PC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-13359 Secure MD Professionals - California, PC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Secure MD Professionals - California, PC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Secure MD Professionals - California, PC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- SF38020.DAWKINS - ANS TO COMPLAINT.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Dawkins- CA POS Sub 02.23.21 v1.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied- 20210218140003350.pdf; Comment: Defective proof of service of summons and complaint, also line #1.c. does not match complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint- Comment: Defective Proof: Served by Substituted Service on 1/8/2021 Reason: Judicial Council form POS-010 is required, and address listed in #4 is not address registered with secretary of the state for agent for servie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- 5232055 - SIGNED POS.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dawkins, Leslie: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-00795 Dawkins, Leslie $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dawkins, Leslie: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Dawkins, Leslie; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 5/13/21 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- 20210105140038004.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 20210105140041807.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 20210105140034033.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSE ADAM MORRIS