This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 11:42:02 (UTC).

Leonardo Reyes vs. Dave & Buster's of California, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Leonardo Reyes filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dave Buster's of California, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2255

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Reyes, Leonardo

Martinez, Anna

Defendant

Dave & Buster's of California, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paboojian, Warren R.

Defendant Attorney

Dorris Egerer, Ashley

 

Court Documents

7-26-22 Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received

07/26/2022: 7-26-22 Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received

7-26-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/26/2022: 7-26-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

7-26-22 Complaint

07/26/2022: 7-26-22 Complaint

7-26-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

07/26/2022: 7-26-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

7-27-22 Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed

07/27/2022: 7-27-22 Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed

8-1-22 Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees Pursuant to CCP 631(b)

08/01/2022: 8-1-22 Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees Pursuant to CCP 631(b)

8-1-22 Summons

08/02/2022: 8-1-22 Summons

8/9/2022-Proof of Service

08/09/2022: 8/9/2022-Proof of Service

8/31/2022 Answer

08/31/2022: 8/31/2022 Answer

9/2/22 Defendant's Jury Deposit

09/02/2022: 9/2/22 Defendant's Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement

11/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/16/2022: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dave & Buster's of California, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-54694 Dave & Buster's of California, Inc. $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dave & Buster's of California, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Defendant's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dave & Buster's of California, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-54163 Dave & Buster's, Inc. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dave & Buster's of California, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Dave & Buster's of California, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees Pursuant to CCP 631(b)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Reyes, Leonardo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-45706 Reyes, Leonardo $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Reyes, Leonardo: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Reyes, Leonardo; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Guardian Ad Litem Received; Comment: *order signed and fwd to clerks office on 7/27/22* Forwarded to Dept. 403

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVE & BUSTER'S OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant