This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 05:50:14 (UTC).

Laura Rodriguez vs. Jennifer Beckman

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Laura Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Jennifer Beckman. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Gaab, Kimberly and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1247

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Gaab, Kimberly

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Laura Hernandez

Defendants

Beckman, Carl

Beckman, Jennifer

Beckman Tower Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Woodhead, Greg R.

Defendant Attorneys

Malcolm, Stacey L.

O'Driscoll, Brian H.

 

Court Documents

1/11/22 change of lead counsel

01/11/2022: 1/11/22 change of lead counsel

Notice

10/04/2021: Notice

signed ADR stip.pdf

09/27/2021: signed ADR stip.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

08/26/2021: Minute Order Attachment

45834CaseMana00d0abf

08/09/2021: 45834CaseMana00d0abf

Plaintiffs Notice of Posting Jury Fees.pdf

08/06/2021: Plaintiffs Notice of Posting Jury Fees.pdf

Case Management Statement - POS Combined.pdf

08/06/2021: Case Management Statement - POS Combined.pdf

Notice

07/21/2021: Notice

Notice of Jury Deposit

07/21/2021: Notice of Jury Deposit

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

07/21/2021: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

07/19/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

07/19/2021: Proof of Service

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

05/03/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons (SCANNED).pdf

05/03/2021: Summons (SCANNED).pdf

Civil Case Cover Sheet (SCANNED).pdf

04/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (SCANNED).pdf

Complaint (SCANNED).pdf

04/30/2021: Complaint (SCANNED).pdf

Notice Filed

1/11/22 change of lead counsel; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name & Handling Attorney

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Firm Name and Address Change

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated 5-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name & Handling Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Firm Name and Address Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James Dilling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties; Comment: Estimated 5-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rodriguez, Laura Hernandez: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-27184 Rodriguez, Laura Hernandez $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rodriguez, Laura Hernandez: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Rodriguez, Laura Hernandez; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 8/26/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Woodhead, Greg R