This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 04:11:34 (UTC).

Lashell Wallace vs. City of Fresno

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Lashell Wallace filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Fresno. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2736

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wallace, Lashell

Defendants

City of Fresno

County of Fresno

Caltrans

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ostoia, Adina A

 

Court Documents

9-2-22 Complaint

09/02/2022: 9-2-22 Complaint

9-2-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/02/2022: 9-2-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

9-6-22 Summons

09/06/2022: 9-6-22 Summons

9-6-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

09/06/2022: 9-6-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

1/3/23 Minute Order Attachment

01/03/2023: 1/3/23 Minute Order Attachment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wallace, Lashell: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-55070 Wallace, Lashell $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wallace, Lashell: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Wallace, Lashell; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less