This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/18/2022 at 23:04:08 (UTC).

CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE #19CECG00891

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE 19CECG00891 was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Tharpe, D Tyler and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4455

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Tharpe, D Tyler

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Snapp, Larry David

Defendants

Walker, Phillip S

Phenix Transportation West, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berdinella, Michael W.

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Related Case, CM-015

Civil case cover sheet

{{FilingCodeDescription}}

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference hearing and assignment of Judge for all purposes

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Amended Document Filed

08/26/2020: Amended Document Filed

Proposed Order

08/25/2020: Proposed Order

Stipulation

08/25/2020: Stipulation

Proof of Service

08/21/2020: Proof of Service

Case Management Statement

08/12/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

08/12/2020: Proof of Service

Civil Document

07/10/2020: Civil Document

Notice Filed

06/15/2020: Notice Filed

Civil Document

05/04/2020: Civil Document

Civil Document

04/07/2020: Civil Document

Notice of Hearing

12/11/2019: Notice of Hearing

Summons

12/11/2019: Summons

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions; Party; Names: Phenix Transportation West, Inc; Snapp, Larry David; Walker, Phillip S; Comment: SEE 8/31/2020 ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Order to Consolidate with case #19CECG00981

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Snapp, Larry David: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-56778 Snapp, Larry David $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Snapp, Larry David: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: **Order signed and FWD to clerk's office on 08/31/20** Forwarded to Dept: 403 Order for: Amended Proposed Order to consolidate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: **Order NOT signed; on 8/26/20 Judge requests party to resubmit due to incorrect case number in body of Order only. Additional fee not required per KCK.** Forwarded to Dept. 403 Order for : Order to Consolidate Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation Filed; Comment: Stipulation to Consolidate Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Snapp, Larry David: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-97845 Snapp, Larry David $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Snapp, Larry David: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Snapp, Larry David; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of Case Management Conference hearing and assignment of Judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Related Case, CM-015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Phenix Transportation West Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berdinella, Michael W.