This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 16:51:57 (UTC).

Larry Joyner vs. Faustino Verduzco Rios

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Larry Joyner filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Faustino Verduzco Rios. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Brickey, Gabriel, Negin, Stephanie and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1497

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

Negin, Stephanie

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joyner, Larry

Defendants

Verduzco Rios, Faustino

Gardner Trucking, Inc.

Gardner Trucking Conversion, LLC.

CRST Expedited, Inc.

Gardner Trucking, LLC.

Groves and Gardner Trucking Incorporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gazda, Tara G.

Defendant Attorney

Canada, Richard B.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation

04/20/2022: Stipulation

Case Management Statement

04/06/2022: Case Management Statement

4/21/2022 - Minute Order Attachment

04/21/2022: 4/21/2022 - Minute Order Attachment

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Notice Filed

Proof of Service; Comment: and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Hearing on 9/23/21

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

4/6/22 CMC Stmt

04/06/2022: 4/6/22 CMC Stmt

2/9/22 Request for Partial Dismissal

02/09/2022: 2/9/22 Request for Partial Dismissal

2/2/22 Proof of Service

02/02/2022: 2/2/22 Proof of Service

2/2/22 Proof of Service

02/02/2022: 2/2/22 Proof of Service

1-26-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint of CRST Expedited, Inc.

01/26/2022: 1-26-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint of CRST Expedited, Inc.

1-26-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint of Gardner Trucking Conversion, LLc

01/26/2022: 1-26-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint of Gardner Trucking Conversion, LLc

1/4/2022 Request for Dismissal

01/04/2022: 1/4/2022 Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

01/04/2022: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

01/03/2022: Case Management Statement

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated time is 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2024
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties; Comment: Estimated time 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Judge Patrick J. O'Hara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: 4/21/22 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: HRG date 4/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party; Names: Gardner Trucking Conversion, LLC.; CRST Expedited, Inc.; Comment: without prejudice as to parties only

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed; Comment: Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: and Acknowledgement of Receipt - Defective: Printed name and name of entity on behalf of missing where date is placed. Title of person signing missing from signature area as well.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Joyner, Larry: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-32651 Joyner, Larry $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Joyner, Larry: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Joyner, Larry; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gardner Trucking Conversion, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDNER TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CRST Expedited, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANADA RICHARD BRENT