This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 16:16:05 (UTC).

Keo Vanh vs. Cal-Valley Insurance Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Keo Vanh filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cal-Valley Insurance Services, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Tharpe, D Tyler and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3423

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vanh, Keo

Defendant

Cal-Valley Insurance Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cornwell, Stephen R.

Defendant Attorney

Schwob, Landon R.

 

Court Documents

Association of Attorney filed

Association of Attorney/Counsel; Comment: Nicholas Urgesi from Freedman Law is hereby associated.

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Defendant Cal-Valley Insurance Services, Inc.'s Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: Notice of change of time and department for CMC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed- Association of Attorney/Counsel; Comment: Nicholas Urgesi from Freedman Law is hereby associated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cal-Valley Insurance Services, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-01430 Cal-Valley Insurance Services, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cal-Valley Insurance Services, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Cal-Valley Insurance Services, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Defendant Cal-Valley Insurance Services, Inc.'s Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: Notice of change of time and department for CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Vanh, Keo: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-75797 Vanh, Keo $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Vanh, Keo: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Vanh, Keo; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cornwell, Stephen R