This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/20/2023 at 10:24:51 (UTC).

Kenneth Leon Faulkner (CONS/PE)

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Kenneth Leon Faulkner CONS/PE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Arax, Brian M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0523

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Arax, Brian M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Faulkner-Vasquez, Cynthia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hushing-Kline, Brighton

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketContinued Hearing by Court; Judicial Officer: Arax, Brian M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person and Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire Case); Comment: "Dismissal entered as requested" (cc emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Probate Conservator; Judicial Officer: Arax, Brian M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of ther Person & Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: of C.I. report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketConfidential Court Investigation Report; Comment: Case dismissed, no fee entry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketConservatorship Video Viewed; Comment: cc emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Date: 6/23/2022 Time: 9:00am Dept: 303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCitation for Conservatorship; Comment: Date: 6/23/2022 Time: 9:00am Dept 303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Faulkner-Vasquez, Cynthia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-28428 Faulkner-Vasquez, Cynthia $495.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Faulkner-Vasquez, Cynthia: Transaction Assessment $495.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Faulkner-Vasquez, Cynthia; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Hrg: 6/23/2022 Time: 9:00am Dept: 303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketOrder (Generic); Judicial Officer: Arax, Brian M; Comment: Order on Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of the ( X ) Person ( X ) Estate Facts stated are insufficient to support appointment of a temporary conservator ex parte. Temporary Petition is DENIED re (X) PERSON (X) ESTATE cc emailed & mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator; Comment: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of the Person and Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial); Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of ther Person & Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less