This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/30/2019 at 02:03:25 (UTC).

Keith E Perkins (Estate)

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 Keith E Perkins Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0572

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Perkins, John W

Decedent

Perkins, Keith E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wall, Jeffrey L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • HearingProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • HearingProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • HearingCreditor's Claim- Comment: Amount: $1,263.32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • HearingLetters (Estates)- Comment: cc undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • HearingOrder for Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: cc undeliverable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • HearingPetition- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • HearingProof of Publication- Comment: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • HearingWaiver- Comment: Waiver of Bond Michiko

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • HearingWaiver- Comment: Waiver of Bond Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • HearingWaiver- Comment: Waiver of Bond Edna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • HearingNotice of Petition to Administer Estate- Comment: Hearing: 8/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • HearingConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities- Comment: Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (DE-147S Form)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • HearingDuties and Liabilities (Estates)- Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • HearingPetition (Generic)- Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wall, Jeffrey L: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00003288 Wall, Jeffrey L $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wall, Jeffrey L: Transaction Assessment $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Wall, Jeffrey L; Total Financial Assessment $51.00; Total Payments and Credits $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.