This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/21/2023 at 04:59:35 (UTC).

Katie Chavez vs. Ellie Rosenberg

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 Katie Chavez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Ellie Rosenberg. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Skiles, Jon M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1554

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Negin, Stephanie

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Skiles, Jon M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chavez, Katie

Defendants

Rosenberg, Ellie

United Security Bank

a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Setareh, Shaun

Defendant Attorney

Helsley, Michael S.

 

Court Documents

5/23/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/23/2022: 5/23/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/22 Summons

05/24/2022: 5/24/22 Summons

5/24/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

05/24/2022: 5/24/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

5/23/22 Complaint

05/23/2022: 5/23/22 Complaint

2-17-23 Notice of Entry of Stipulated Protective Order

02/17/2023: 2-17-23 Notice of Entry of Stipulated Protective Order

2-14-23 Stipulation and Order filed

02/14/2023: 2-14-23 Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulated Protective Order [Proposed] Order

02/10/2023: Stipulated Protective Order [Proposed] Order

1/20/23 Notice of Judge Reassignment

01/20/2023: 1/20/23 Notice of Judge Reassignment

10/12/22 Jury Fees Paid

10/12/2022: 10/12/22 Jury Fees Paid

9-21-22 Minute Order Attachment

09/21/2022: 9-21-22 Minute Order Attachment

9/19/22 Defendants' Deposit of Jury Fees

09/19/2022: 9/19/22 Defendants' Deposit of Jury Fees

09/14/22 Stipulation Regarding ADR

09/14/2022: 09/14/22 Stipulation Regarding ADR

United Security WT Plfs CMS.pdf

09/07/2022: United Security WT Plfs CMS.pdf

Case Management Statement

09/07/2022: Case Management Statement

07/11/22 Defendant's Answer to Complaint

07/11/2022: 07/11/22 Defendant's Answer to Complaint

7/6/22 POS (Rosenberg)

07/06/2022: 7/6/22 POS (Rosenberg)

7/6/22 POS (United Security Bank)

07/06/2022: 7/6/22 POS (United Security Bank)

6/20/2022-Proof of Service of Summons (United Security)

06/20/2022: 6/20/2022-Proof of Service of Summons (United Security)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 7-10 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2024
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Entry of Stipulated Protective Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Skiles, Jon M; Comment: protective order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Chavez, Katie: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-09801 Chavez, Katie $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Chavez, Katie: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: *Order forwarded to clerk's office for further processing on 02-14-2023 FWD to 403 - Stipulated Protective Order [Proposed] Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Skiles, Jon M; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Case Reassigned to Judge Jon M. Skiles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: ***Defective: Relationship to the party listed in Item 3a is not listed in Item 3b. Title of Signing party is missing from Notice and Acknowledgment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: ***Relationship to the party listed in Item 3a is not listed in Item 3b. Title of Signing party is missing from Notice and Acknowledgment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Chavez, Katie: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-31527 Chavez, Katie $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Chavez, Katie: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Chavez, Katie; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less