This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 05:51:10 (UTC).

Kathy Robinson vs Whitney Robinson

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Kathy Robinson filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Whitney Robinson. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3359

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robinson, Kathy

Respondent

Robinson, Whitney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kharazi, Hadi-Ty S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Judgment Type: Restraining Order after Hearing; Party Names: Robinson, Kathy; Robinson, Whitney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order-Orders electronically mailed- Comment: MO and DV130

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketJudge Brickey Minute Order. See Attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Reissued- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order-Orders electronically mailed- Comment: MO/ DV116/ Zoom info

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketReissuance OSC/TRO- Comment: Last Hearing: 10/08/2021 Reissued Hearing to: 11/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketJudge Brickey Minute Order. See Attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketTRO Order to Show Cause- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDomestic Violence OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketApplication and Declaration for Order DV w/o Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketApplication and Declaration for Order DV w/o Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHARAZI, HADI-TY S