This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/07/2020 at 13:07:40 (UTC).

Julian Urban vs. IRE Pallets, Inc./CLASS ACTION

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Julian Urban filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against IRE Pallets, Inc /CLASS ACTION. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2702

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Urban, Julian Torres

Torres, Julian

Defendant

IRE Pallets, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selik, Evan M

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Reassignment of Judge and Department Change

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Notice; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Managment Conferece and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (emailed)

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Class Complaint.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Reassignment of Judge and Department Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Urban, Julian Torres: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-61613 Urban, Julian Torres $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Urban, Julian Torres: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Urban, Julian Torres; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified- Notice; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Managment Conferece and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Class Complaint.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less