This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/18/2022 at 04:26:30 (UTC).

Jovita Ayala vs. Chaudhry Medical, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Jovita Ayala filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chaudhry Medical, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3863

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ayala, Jovita

Defendants

Chaudhry, Pervaiz Akhter

Chaudhry Medical, Inc.

CMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Busick, Mark B.

Defendant Attorney

Ratliff, Benjamin L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: *Department Change*

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James A Dilling

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Fees

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Chaudhry Medical, Inc. dba CMI

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Pervaiz Akhter

4/7/2022 Request for Dismissal

04/07/2022: 4/7/2022 Request for Dismissal

Complaint In Intervention (No Fee)

10/21/2021: Complaint In Intervention (No Fee)

Stipulation and Order filed

10/13/2021: Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order

10/08/2021: Stipulation and Order

Notice

08/25/2021: Notice

Notice of Change of Firm Name

03/30/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed

01/21/2021: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed

Proposed Order

01/20/2021: Proposed Order

Stipulation and Order

01/20/2021: Stipulation and Order

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Cannot dismiss entire action without the signature of the Intervener's attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed; Comment: Intervene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: intervention in pending action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketTransfer of Fees Completed; Comment: For WEB-2021-64420

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: ***Order signed and entered*** Forwarded to 502 - Stipulation re: Ohio Security's Intervention in Pending Action; [proposed] Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice Change of Handling Atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: Defective Proof: Served by Substituted Service on 12/3/19 Reason: #3a - Party Served name does not match party listed on Complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Pervaiz Akhter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Chaudhry Medical, Inc. dba CMI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ayala, Jovita: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-84433 Ayala, Jovita $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ayala, Jovita: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Ayala, Jovita; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chaudhry Medical, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ratliff, Benjamin L