This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 21:33:42 (UTC).

Jose Salgado vs. Auto Deals, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 Jose Salgado filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Auto Deals, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8431

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salgado, Jose H

Defendants

Auto Deals, Inc.

Cars 2 Go, a California Corporation

Bank of Stockton

Surety

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadr, Kasra

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

7301-CCCS.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

7301-Complaint.pdf

Summons issued and filed

7301- Summons.pdf

Notice of Hearing

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference; Comment: CMC set on 2/22/2022 at 3:30 p.m., Department 402.

7301-CCCS.pdf

10/29/2021: 7301-CCCS.pdf

7301-Complaint.pdf

10/29/2021: 7301-Complaint.pdf

7301- Summons.pdf

11/04/2021: 7301- Summons.pdf

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

11/04/2021: CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

2/2/22 Case Management Statement HRG 2/22/2022

02/02/2022: 2/2/22 Case Management Statement HRG 2/22/2022

2/2/2022 Proof of Service

02/02/2022: 2/2/2022 Proof of Service

2/2/2022 Proof of Service

02/02/2022: 2/2/2022 Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

02/22/2022: Minute Order Attachment

4/11/2022- Request For Entry of Default

04/11/2022: 4/11/2022- Request For Entry of Default

4/11/2022- Request For Entry of Default

04/11/2022: 4/11/2022- Request For Entry of Default

4/14/22 Proof of Service of Summons; Complaint as to Auto Deals Inc

04/14/2022: 4/14/22 Proof of Service of Summons; Complaint as to Auto Deals Inc

4/14/22 Proof of Service of Summons; Complaint as to Bank of Stockton

04/14/2022: 4/14/22 Proof of Service of Summons; Complaint as to Bank of Stockton

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: Defective- Unable to determine that person listed in Item 5b is authorized to accept service on behalf of party in Item 3a per CCP 416.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: Defective- Unable to determine that person listed in Item 5b is authorized to accept service on behalf of party in Item 3a per CCP 416.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Proof of Service is defective.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Proof of Service is defective

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: Defective substituted service on 12/7/2021. Reason: 3b does not indicate person listed as an authorized agent.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Salgado, Jose H: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-70105 Salgado, Jose H $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Salgado, Jose H: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Salgado, Jose H; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set on 2/22/2022 at 3:30 p.m., Department 402.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Deals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BANK OF STOCKTON is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA