This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/18/2020 at 16:03:34 (UTC).

Jose Orduno vs. AS Dezign, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 Jose Orduno filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AS Dezign, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2449

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orduno, Jose

Defendants

AS Dezign, Inc.

Asphalt Design by Juan Gomez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donahoo, Richard E, Attorney

Donahoo, Richard E

Defendant Attorney

Agrall, Tracy A.

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

POS- AS Dezign.pdf

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons issued and filed

50366.Summons.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

50366.Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

50366.Orduno Complaint FINAL 082020.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for AS Dezign, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-63285 AS Dezign, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for AS Dezign, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: AS Dezign, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- POS- AS Dezign.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Orduno, Jose: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-55994 Orduno, Jose $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Orduno, Jose: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Orduno, Jose; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- 50366.Summons.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 50366.Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 50366.Orduno Complaint FINAL 082020.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONAHOO RICHARD EARL