This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/07/2019 at 04:26:43 (UTC).

Jose Larin Funes vs. Westside Self Service Auto Dismantlers

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by Jose Larin Funes against Westside Self Service Auto Dismantlers in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2238

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larin Funes, Jose Daniel

Defendants

Westside Self Service Auto Dismantlers

Guerrero Family Trust

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Full Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC/CJAP

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Larin Funes, Jose Daniel; Westside Self Service Auto Dismantlers; Guerrero Family Trust; Comment: With prejudice

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: paid by plaintiff

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Larin Funes, Jose Daniel; Westside Self Service Auto Dismantlers; Guerrero Family Trust; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Full Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of jury fees by plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC/CJAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Larin Funes, Jose Daniel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50544 Larin Funes, Jose Daniel $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Larin Funes, Jose Daniel: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Larin Funes, Jose Daniel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50148 Larin Funes, Jose Daniel $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Larin Funes, Jose Daniel: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial: Larin Funes, Jose Daniel; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less