This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 19:34:31 (UTC).

John Doe vs. Clovis Unified School District, a public entity

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 John Doe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Clovis Unified School District, a public entity. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1008

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Doe, John

Defendants

Aprile, Stacey

an individual

Clovis Unified School District, a public entity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis, James W.

Defendant Attorneys

Cox, Blaine R.

DeMaria, Anthony N.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

205216.205216.040821 - Civil Case Cover Sheet - Av.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint - Avenell.pdf

Summons issued and filed

205216.205216.040821 - Summons - Avenell.pdf

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

Notice Filed

224235.224235.pdf; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement Filed

221336.221336.DOC072621-07262021162652.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order GrantingDefendant Clovis Unified School Distr; Comment: ~ Pending Hearing ~

Request for Judical Notice

Defendant Clovis Unified School District's Request for Judic

Declaration Filed

Declaration of S. Nicole Tucker in Support of Defendant Clov; Comment: S. Nicole Tucker

Demurrer Filed

Defendant Clovis Unified School District's Demurrer to Plain

Notice of Hearing

Defendant Clovis Unified School District's Notice of Motion; Comment: Demurrer set for 2/16/22 at 3:30 PM in Dept 503

Request for Judical Notice

Request; Comment: ISO Demurrer and Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Blaine Cox ISO Demurrer and Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Motion; Comment: ISO Demurrer and Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDemurrer- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Filed 7/8/21 ~ Anthony Demaria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMotion - Strike- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Blaine Cox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDemurrer- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Blaine Cox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Doe, John: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-51134 Doe, John $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Doe, John: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- 224235.224235.pdf; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- 221336.221336.DOC072621-07262021162652.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Clovis Unified School District, a public entity: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-45599 Clovis Unified School District, a public entity $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Clovis Unified School District, a public entity: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- 55.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- pos.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Doe, John: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-22219 Doe, John $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Doe, John: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Doe, John; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- 205216.205216.040821 - Summons - Avenell.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 205216.205216.040821 - Civil Case Cover Sheet - Av.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint - Avenell.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clovis Unified School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS JAMES W.