This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 01:02:20 (UTC).

Joe Morales vs Habib Marian

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Joe Morales filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Habib Marian. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3372

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morales, Joe

Defendant

Marian, Habib

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kreit, Theodore

Defendant Attorney

O'Driscoll, Brian H.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

11/12/21 - Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

11/12/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

11/12/21 - Summons

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Answer Filed

12/16/2021 Answer

Notice Filed

12/16/2021 Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Of Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement Filed

12/16/2021 Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

12/16/2021 Notice of Requirement Re Electronic Service; Comment: Of Requirement Re Electronic Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Marian, Habib: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-79391 Marian, Habib $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Marian, Habib: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Marian, Habib; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- 12/16/2021 Notice of Requirement Re Electronic Service; Comment: Of Requirement Re Electronic Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- 12/16/2021 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- 12/16/2021 Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- 12/16/2021 Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Morales, Joe: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-72794 Morales, Joe $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Morales, Joe: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Morales, Joe; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- 11/12/21 - Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 11/12/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 11/12/21 - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Driscoll, Brian H.