This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 23:07:46 (UTC).

Joe Johnson vs. Highlands Diversified, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 Joe Johnson filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Highlands Diversified, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Simpson, Alan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1977

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson, Joe

Defendants

Highlands Trade Partners

Highlands Diversified, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Otkupman, Roman

Defendant Attorney

Stecker, Laura E

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: pending arbitration

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Arbitration Status Conference Status set for 5/5/2020 at 3:30 pm in Dept. 503

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Posting Jury Fees

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 502 Order for: Joint Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and Stay Proceedings

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Request for Dismissal

07/31/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

07/07/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

07/06/2020: Notice of Hearing

Stipulation and Order filed

07/06/2020: Stipulation and Order filed

Proposed Order

07/02/2020: Proposed Order

Stipulation

07/02/2020: Stipulation

Request for Dismissal

06/25/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

06/16/2020: Notice of Hearing

Notice Filed

06/15/2020: Notice Filed

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/16/2020

DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2020

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Johnson, Joe; Highlands Diversified, Inc.; Comment; Comment: (As to Causes of Action #1-3); Comment; Comment: (With Prejudice)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2020

DocketArbitration Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2020

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment; Comment: (As to Cause of Action #4); Comment; Comment: (Without Prejudice)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 9/16/2020 at 1:30 pm in Dept. 402

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Comment: to lift stay

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2020

FinancialFinancial info for Johnson, Joe: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-46214 Johnson, Joe $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2020

FinancialFinancial info for Johnson, Joe: Transaction Assessment $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

FinancialFinancial info for Johnson, Joe: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-44532 Johnson, Joe $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

FinancialFinancial info for Johnson, Joe: Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

FinancialFinancial: Johnson, Joe; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil case cover sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Complaint filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/01/1900

DocketChambers Work- Pre; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less