This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/16/2023 at 16:20:15 (UTC).

Jessica Sandoval vs. Capstone Logistics, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Jessica Sandoval filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Capstone Logistics, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jr., Jeffrey Y., Mangano, Robert, Gaab, Kimberly and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2111

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jr., Jeffrey Y.

Mangano, Robert

Gaab, Kimberly

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sandoval, Jessica Alejandra

Sandoval, Valeria

Defendant

Capstone Logistics, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kanani, Navid

Defendant Attorney

Zator, Harrison M.

 

Court Documents

05/16/23 Minute Order Attachment From Chambers re: Stay and Arbitration Status Conference set for 05

05/16/2023: 05/16/23 Minute Order Attachment From Chambers re: Stay and Arbitration Status Conference set for 05

5/11/23 Status Report re Arb HRG 5/18/23

05/11/2023: 5/11/23 Status Report re Arb HRG 5/18/23

4/27/23 - Request For Dismissal

04/27/2023: 4/27/23 - Request For Dismissal

4-4-23 Notice of Settlement

04/04/2023: 4-4-23 Notice of Settlement

3-29-23 Request for Dismissal

03/29/2023: 3-29-23 Request for Dismissal

1-25-23 Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Re-assignment)

01/25/2023: 1-25-23 Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Re-assignment)

Notice or Order Staying Action

11/14/2022: Notice or Order Staying Action

11-9-22 (Proposed) Order on Joint Stipulation to Submit Claims to Binding Arbitration & Stay Action

11/09/2022: 11-9-22 (Proposed) Order on Joint Stipulation to Submit Claims to Binding Arbitration & Stay Action

11-1-22 Minute Order Attachment

11/01/2022: 11-1-22 Minute Order Attachment

Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

11/01/2022: Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

10-28-22 Notice of Remote Appearance

10/28/2022: 10-28-22 Notice of Remote Appearance

10-28-22 First Amended Complaint

10/28/2022: 10-28-22 First Amended Complaint

Capstone's CMC Statement.pdf

10/17/2022: Capstone's CMC Statement.pdf

CMS-SIGNED.pdf

10/13/2022: CMS-SIGNED.pdf

09.27.2022 Stipulation and Order to extend Defendant's deadline to respond to Complaint

09/27/2022: 09.27.2022 Stipulation and Order to extend Defendant's deadline to respond to Complaint

9/22/22 Joint Stip to Extend Responsive Pleading

09/22/2022: 9/22/22 Joint Stip to Extend Responsive Pleading

8-11-22 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

08/11/2022: 8-11-22 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

07/20/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/18/2023

DocketArbitration Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jr., Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jr., Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Sandoval, Jessica Alejandra; Sandoval, Valeria; Capstone Logistics, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: w/ Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - From Chambers re: Stay and Arbitration Status Conference set for 05/18/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jr., Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement filed; Comment: Joint Report to Court re Status of Arbitration; Notice of Settlement and Dismissal of Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Case stayed. Clerk is not authorized to grant dismissals when case is stayed. Stay must be lifted in order for Clerk to grant dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Settlement (no action taken, case stayed)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Case stayed. Clerk is not authorized to grant dismissals when case is stayed, stay must be lifted in order for Clerk to grant dismissal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Case Stayed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Re-assignment)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
09/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: FWD to 503 - Stipulation to Continue Defendant's Responsive Pleading Deadline; [Proposed] Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022

DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 08/09/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

FinancialFinancial info for Sandoval, Jessica Alejandra: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-43793 Sandoval, Jessica Alejandra $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

FinancialFinancial info for Sandoval, Jessica Alejandra: Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

FinancialFinancial: Sandoval, Jessica Alejandra; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil case cover sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Complaint filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less