This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/14/2020 at 23:11:05 (UTC).

Jesse McCray, JR (Estate)

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Jesse McCray, JR Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0605

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

McCray-Straughter, Viva

Decedent

McCray, Jesse, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

Wall, Jeffrey L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal (Final)- Comment: Total Amount: $170,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCreditor's Claim- Comment: Amount: $$1195.15 (cc AB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCreditor's Claim- Comment: Amount: $1152.73 (cc AB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for McCray-Straughter, Viva: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00003069 Jeffrey Wall $76.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for McCray-Straughter, Viva: Transaction Assessment $76.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketLetters (Estates)- Comment: of Administration (cc emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketOrder for Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: Order Appointing Administrator; Order Authorizing Independent Administration of Estate with full authority (cc emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketPetition - Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketDocument filed- Comment: Consent to Elec Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketWaiver- Comment: Waiver of Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketWaiver- Comment: Waiver of Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for McCray-Straughter, Viva: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-49773 McCray-Straughter, Viva $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for McCray-Straughter, Viva: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: McCray-Straughter, Viva; Total Financial Assessment $511.50; Total Payments and Credits $511.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities- Comment: Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (DE-147S Form)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities (Estates)- Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketPetition (Generic)- Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.