Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/07/2020 at 16:03:24 (UTC).

Jeffrey Souza vs Carlos Camarillo

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 Jeffrey Souza filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Carlos Camarillo. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1962

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Souza, Jeffrey

Defendant

Camarillo, Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mazzela, Timothy Wayne

Defendant Attorney

Messina, Irene C

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

79137659 - NTC OF POSTING JURY FEES.pdf; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fees posted by Plaintiff

Answer Filed

79137659 - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT.pdf

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 11/10/20 at 1:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Souza, Jeffrey: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-58297 Souza, Jeffrey $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Souza, Jeffrey: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Camarillo, Carlos: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-58428 Camarillo, Carlos $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Camarillo, Carlos: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- 79137659 - NTC OF POSTING JURY FEES.pdf; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposit, payment,disbursment- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fees posted by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Camarillo, Carlos: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-57419 Camarillo, Carlos $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Camarillo, Carlos: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Camarillo, Carlos; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- 79137659 - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Souza, Jeffrey: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-47810 Souza, Jeffrey $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Souza, Jeffrey: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Souza, Jeffrey; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 11/10/20 at 1:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESSINA IRENE C.