This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/26/2020 at 02:16:14 (UTC).

Vicki Bethel Condley (Estate)

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 Vicki Bethel Condley Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0578

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cullen-Ruck, Candice

Decedents

Condley, Jeffrey

Condley, Vicki Bethel

Vicki Jo Bethel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Petty, Jonathon L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • HearingProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • HearingOrder to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • HearingContinued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • HearingProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • HearingCreditor's Claim- Comment: Amount: $127,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • HearingWill Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • HearingLetters (Estates)- Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • HearingOrder for Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • HearingPetition - Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • HearingDeclaration- Comment: Declaration of Jonathon L. Petty in Support of Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • HearingProof of Publication- Comment: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • HearingNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • HearingDuties and Liabilities (Estates)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • HearingConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • HearingDeclaration- Comment: Declaration of Jonathan L. Petty in Support of Petition for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • HearingPetition for Probate (Initial)- Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.