Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/26/2020 at 12:16:21 (UTC).

Jeanne Todisco vs. Michael Patton

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Jeanne Todisco filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Michael Patton. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3172

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Todisco, Jeanne Irene

Bergstrom, Curtis

Defendants

Patton, Michael Thomas

Central Valley Lawnscapes Construction & Maintenance Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cornwell, Stephen R.

Defendant Attorney

Sabaitis, Frank T.

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Central Valley Lawnscapes Construction & Maintenance Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-79538 Central Valley Lawnscapes Construction & Maintenance Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Central Valley Lawnscapes Construction & Maintenance Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Central Valley Lawnscapes Construction & Maintenance Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Todisco, Jeanne Irene: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-70366 Todisco, Jeanne Irene $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Todisco, Jeanne Irene: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Todisco, Jeanne Irene; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cornwell, Stephen R