This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 05:48:36 (UTC).

Jaspreet Kaur vs Tavleen Singh

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Jaspreet Kaur filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Tavleen Singh. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kalemkarian, David, Mangano, Robert and Wells, Ryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0304

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kalemkarian, David

Mangano, Robert

Wells, Ryan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kaur, Jaspreet

Respondent

Singh, Tavleen

Minor

Khehra, Ekamjot Kaur

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Abrams, Robert C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketHearing w/o Temp Restrng Order- Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketReturn Readiness- Tier I- Judicial Officer: Wells, Ryan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFCS Tier 1 Mediation- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: FCS Neither Parent Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order-Orders electronically mailed- Comment: Minute Order and DV116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketReissuance OSC/TRO- Comment: Last Hearing: 8/3/21 Reissued Hearing to: 10/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketJudge Wells minute order .See attached.- Comment: Dept 201 09:20am Judge: R Wells Clerk: M Rivera Reporter: N Duarte Petitioner: Present/ Counsel: R Abrams-zoom Respondent: Present/ ProPer-crtroom Hrg type: Hrg w/o TRO Punjabi Court Interpreter: K Dhindsa for Respondent Continued to: 10/26/21 at 8:30am in Dept 201- Issues: Reissued-hrg w/o TRO Other: Respondent states that he would like to continue on today's date, however, the court trails the matter to allow respondent to contact his criminal attorney. The court advises the respondent of his 5th amendment right against self-incrimination due to his pending criminal matter F21900101. The court recalls the matter at 9:40 a.m. Respondent is requesting to continue the matter. No temporary restraining orders were granted in this case. Copy of today's minute order will be emailed to parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketHearing w/o Temp Restrng Order- Judicial Officer: Wells, Ryan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued Party's Motion; Comment: cont'd from 7/6/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order-Orders electronically mailed- Comment: MO w/zoom info and DV116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketReissuance OSC/TRO- Comment: Last Hearing: 07/06/21 Reissued Hearing to: 8/3/21

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Singh, Tavleen; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketResponse- Comment: and Request for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kaur, Jaspreet: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kaur, Jaspreet: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Kaur, Jaspreet; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abrams, Robert C