This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/19/2020 at 23:25:51 (UTC).

Jasmin Santos (CONS/P)

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 Jasmin Santos CONS/P was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kazanjian, Debra and Cardoza, Jane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0608

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kazanjian, Debra

Cardoza, Jane

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Santos Garcia, Silvina

Garcia, Silvia Santos

Santos Garcia, Pedro

Garcia De Santos, Dominga

Santos, Dominga Garcia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • HearingConfidential Notification of Order Modifying Voting Rights- Comment: Order regarding voting rights affected in a conservatorship.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • HearingLetters of Conservatorship- Comment: cc and cert. copy given

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • HearingOrder Appointing Probate Conservator- Judicial Officer: Cardoza, Jane; Comment: cc given

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • HearingContinued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Cardoza, Jane; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • HearingCitation for Conservatorship- Comment: Hearing: 9/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • HearingNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • HearingPetition - Appoint Probate Conservator- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • HearingConservatorship Video Viewed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • HearingConservatorship Video Viewed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • HearingConservatorship Video Viewed

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2019
  • HearingConfidential Conservator Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HearingConfidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HearingDuties of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HearingOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HearingPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial)- Comment: orders and letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Santos Garcia, Pedro: Fee Waiver $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Santos Garcia, Pedro: Transaction Assessment $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Santos Garcia, Pedro: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Santos Garcia, Pedro: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Santos Garcia, Pedro; Total Financial Assessment $461.00; Total Payments and Credits $461.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.