This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 23:15:20 (UTC).

Janice McDaniel (Estate)

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Janice McDaniel Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0594

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Briscoe, Nick

Strayer, Christopher

Decedent

McDaniel, Janice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mele, James J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • HearingProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • HearingProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • HearingInventory and Appraisal (Final)- Comment: Total Amount: $365,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HearingWill Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HearingLetters (Estates)- Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HearingOrder for Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HearingContinued Hearing by Court- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • HearingNotice of Petition to Administer Estate- Comment: (Supplemental)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • HearingDeclaration- Comment: Declaration of James J. Mele Re Revised Attachment 8 - Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • HearingPetition - Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • HearingNotice of Petition to Administer Estate- Comment: Supplemental Notice of Peition to Administer Estate Hearing: 8/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • HearingDeclaration- Comment: Declaration of James J. Mele Re Examiner's Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • HearingDeclaration- Comment: Declaration of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HearingNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HearingDuties and Liabilities (Estates)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • HearingConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • HearingPetition for Probate (Initial)- Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA no o's/l's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mele, James J.: Counter Payment Receipt # PR-2019-00003266 Mele, James J. $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mele, James J.: Transaction Assessment $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Mele, James J.; Total Financial Assessment $51.00; Total Payments and Credits $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.