This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/12/2023 at 01:18:37 (UTC).

Jane Roe 26 vs. Riverdale Assembly of God

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 Jane Roe 26 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Riverdale Assembly of God. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie, Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Mangano, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2580

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Negin, Stephanie

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Mangano, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Roe 26

Defendants

Riverdale Assembly of God

Riverdale Christian Academy, Inc., a California non-profit religious corporation

The General Council of the Assemblies of God

a foreign non-profit religious corporation

The Sourthern California District Council of The Assemblies of God

a California non-profit religious corporation

Whited, Austin

Goad, Terry, JR

Davis, Jalen

Davis, Jed

Spencer, Charles, SR

Doe 18

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dias, Steven S.

 

Court Documents

8-19-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/19/2022: 8-19-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

8-22-22 Summons

08/19/2022: 8-22-22 Summons

8-19-22 Complaint

08/19/2022: 8-19-22 Complaint

8-22-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

08/22/2022: 8-22-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

9/20/22 Dias Dec re Ex parte on Cert of Merit

09/20/2022: 9/20/22 Dias Dec re Ex parte on Cert of Merit

9/20/22 Proposed Order re ex parte on cert of merit

09/20/2022: 9/20/22 Proposed Order re ex parte on cert of merit

9/21/22 Minute Order + CM

09/21/2022: 9/21/22 Minute Order + CM

9/21/22 Order Allowing Sealing Cert of Merit; Service; Leave to Amend

09/21/2022: 9/21/22 Order Allowing Sealing Cert of Merit; Service; Leave to Amend

9-29-22 First Amended Complaint filed

09/29/2022: 9-29-22 First Amended Complaint filed

10/11/22 Amendment to Complaint

10/11/2022: 10/11/22 Amendment to Complaint

11-10-22 Summons to Amended Complaint

11/14/2022: 11-10-22 Summons to Amended Complaint

Case Management Statement

11/30/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

12/01/2022: Minute Order Attachment

9/20/22 Ex Parte re Seal Cert of Merit

09/20/2022: 9/20/22 Ex Parte re Seal Cert of Merit

3-23-23 Case Management Statement

03/23/2023: 3-23-23 Case Management Statement

3/23/23-Minute Order Attachment

03/23/2023: 3/23/23-Minute Order Attachment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance Via Courtcall; Comment: Attorney B Forsythe appearing on behalf of attorney S Dias

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: Chamber's

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Original Type: Chambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed; Comment: Summons to Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment filed; Comment: Document: adding Doe 18 and Doe 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: *order signed w/ modifications and processed on 9/21/22* [Proposed] Order for Allowing: Sealing Certificate of Merit; Service on Defendants: File an Amended Complaint; and Plaintiff Proceed Under Fictitious Name

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Steven Dias ISO Ex Parte Application to Seal Certificates of Merit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx parte Filed; Comment: Ex Parte Application for In-Camera Review to Seal Certificates of Merit, Permit Service on Doe Defendants, Permit Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint and Permit Plaintiff Proceed under Fictitious Name

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jane Roe 26: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-51936 Jane Roe 26 $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jane Roe 26: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Jane Roe 26; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less